WY SF0099 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 177 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 177 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to community health centers and rural health clinics; amending the sunset date for provisions related to grants for capital construction and startup costs for community health centers and rural health clinics; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Community and rural health clinic grants- sunset date.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Charles Scott [R] |
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. Robert McKim [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Chapter No. 177 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-08 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0068 | |
2017-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0068 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0068 |
2017-03-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0068 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 |
2017-02-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-14 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2017-01-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-20 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |