WY SF0098 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mine product taxes; providing an exemption for new production of crude oil and natural gas as specified; providing a sunset date; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Severance tax-exemption.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Perkins [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] |
Rep. David Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2018-03-05 | House | H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2018-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2018-02-22 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-21 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | :Rerefer to S09 - Minerals |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 22-7-1-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-13 | Bill Number Assigned |