WY SF0098 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 178 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Recreation Safety Act; modifying definitions; clarifying that required safety protocols for concussion related injuries are subject to immunity provisions as provided; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School athletic safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - Senate - Concur:Passed 24-2-4-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Concur:Passed 24-2-4-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 178 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0085
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0085
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0085
2015-03-05 Assigned Number SEA No. 0085
2015-03-05SenateConcur:Passed 24-2-4-0-0
2015-03-04SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-03-04House3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0
2015-03-03House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-03-02HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-27HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-27 Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0
2015-02-20HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-02-20HouseRecalled from H04 - Education
2015-02-02HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-30Senate3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0
2015-01-29Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2015-01-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-27SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-26SenateCOW:Laid Back
2015-01-26SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-26 Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-21SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2015-01-20SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback