WY SF0097 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0052
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0052
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; requiring the commonly accepted means of care to be employed in the treatment of any infant born alive; imposing duties on physicians performing abortions; exempting parents from liability for the actions of physicians performing abortions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Born alive infant-means of care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Amendment failed 21-39-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - Amendment failed 17-43-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Amendment failed 21-39-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - Amendment failed 17-43-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0052 | |
2020-03-30 | Veto Message Received | |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0052 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0052 |
2020-03-11 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0052 | |
2020-03-11 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 |
2020-03-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-09 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-06 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2020-03-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-24 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 22-7-1-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |