WY SF0095 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to insurance; providing standards for the use of aftermarket parts in automobile damage repairs; requiring disclosure when any use is proposed of a nonoriginal manufacturer part; requiring that all aftermarket parts be identified and be of the same quality as the original part; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aftermarket parts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseH:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2019-02-21HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29Senate3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0
2019-01-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-25SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-24SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-24SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-01-16SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback