WY SF0095 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to consumer protection; creating the Consumer Protection in Eye Care Act; providing definitions; specifying prohibited acts; providing exemptions; providing requirements to operate a kiosk; establishing standards as specified; providing for enforcement as specified; providing rulemaking authority; providing for a repeal date; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Eye care consumer protection-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Laid Back 39-17-4-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2016-03-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back 39-17-4-0-0 |
2016-03-01 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-29 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-26 | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2016-02-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-16 | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |