WY SF0095 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the legislature; modifying required composition of specified committees; modifying dates for appointments to be made; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative committee membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-03 - Senate - S Adopted SF0095JC01 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-01 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - H12 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - S12 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2011-03-10 Governor Signed SEA No. 0095
2011-03-03 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0095
2011-03-03 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0095
2011-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0095
2011-03-03 (S) Adopted SF0095JC01
2011-03-02 (H) Appointed JCC01 Members
2011-03-01 (S) Appointed JCC01 Members
2011-03-01 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-28 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-25 (H) Passed CoW
2011-02-23 (H) Placed on General File
2011-02-23 (H12) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-02-07 (H) Introduced and Referred to H12
2011-02-04 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-02-03 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-02 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-01 (S) Passed CoW
2011-01-31 (S) Placed on General File
2011-01-31 (S12) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-13 (S) Introduced and Referred to S12
2011-01-13 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback