WY SF0093 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Motion to Do Pass Failed in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; modifying offense of operating a motor vehicle while using a handheld electronic wireless communication device for text based communications to include other communications; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of cell phones while driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S08 Motion to Do Pass Failed in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26SenateMotion to Do Pass Failed in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4
2013-02-04SenateIntroduced and referred to S08; No report prior to CoW Cutoff
2013-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08
2013-01-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback