WY SF0092 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 105 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to administration of government; reorganizing state capital construction entities into a state construction department; specifying powers and duties of the department; providing for appointment of director; removing the construction management program and associated functions from the department of administration and information and generally transferring functions of the program to the state construction department; transferring school facilities department to the state construction department; authorizing the transfer of positions and funds; providing for subsequent budgeting of the state construction department; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State construction department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-26-2-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll call 30- (Y: 30 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 28-27-5-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 105 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed SEA No. 0059
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0059
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0059
2016-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0059
2016-03-03SenateConcur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2016-03-03SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 32-26-2-0-0
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Failed 28-27-5-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-17SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-17 S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 27-3-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback