WY SF0090 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - 3rd Reading:Failed 9-20-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - 3rd Reading:Failed 9-20-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to hemp production; prohibiting the use of smokable hemp in public; prohibiting the sale of smokable hemp to those under age twenty-one; providing criminal and other penalties; requiring labeling of edible hemp products as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hemp prohibitions and requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Flitner [R] | Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Michael Gierau [D] | Sen. Reynolds Kost [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 9-20-1-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 9-20-1-0-0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-05 | Bill Number Assigned |