WY SF0090 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0085
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0085
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state lands; providing for the management and control of certain institutional lands by the board of land commissioners as specified;
Title
Administrative control of acquired institutional lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Gerald Geis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - House - H Adopted SF0090JC01 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted SF0090JC01 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted SF0090JC01 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted SF0090JC01 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted SF0090JC01 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0085 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0085 |
2013-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA0085 | |
2013-02-27 | House | Adopted SF0090JC01 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Adopted SF0090JC01 |
2013-02-25 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Did Not Concur |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-22 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-21 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-14 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-30 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2013-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-28 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to S02 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |