WY SF0087 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of the government; increasing the monetary threshold for which large projects of the Wyoming wildlife and natural resource trust must receive legislative authorization; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Natural resource funding-large project threshold increase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-16-0-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-7-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-7-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Assigned Chapter Number 104 | |
2023-02-27 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0049 | |
2023-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0049 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0049 |
2023-02-21 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0049 | |
2023-02-21 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 46-16-0-0-0 |
2023-02-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-14 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2023-01-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-7-0-0-0 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-20 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |