WY SF0086 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating the offense of burglary for minor theft; specifying elements and penalties of the offense; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Burglary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-02-12 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-31 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-30 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-25 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |