WY SF0085 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to medical assistance; establishing the Medicaid fraud control unit within the office of the attorney general; specifying duties; requiring access to Medicaid records; creating criminal penalties relating to Medicaid; authorizing the aggregation of claims under certain circumstances; authorizing exclusion or suspension of Medicaid providers; making conforming amendments; authorizing the promulgation of rules; repealing provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming Medicaid Fraud Control Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 96
2019-02-26 Governor Signed SEA No. 0046
2019-02-21HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0046
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0046
2019-02-20 Assigned Number SEA No. 0046
2019-02-20SenateConcur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
2019-02-20SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-19House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2019-02-15House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-14HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-12HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-12HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0
2019-01-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-22SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-18SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-18SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-14SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback