WY SF0084 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - 3rd Reading:Failed 20-38-4-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - 3rd Reading:Failed 20-38-4-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring the state superintendent of public instruction to develop model rules and policies for student attendance; requiring rulemaking; requiring reporting; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education-model student attendance policies.
Sponsors
Rep. Ocean Andrew [R] | Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Jeremy Haroldson [R] | Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] |
Sen. Evie Brennan [R] | Sen. Affie Ellis [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 20-38-4-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-02-14 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 20-38-4-0-0 |
2023-02-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-14 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2023-01-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-16 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-09 | Bill Number Assigned |