WY SF0083 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to abortions; prohibiting chemical abortion drugs for abortions as specified; providing exceptions; providing a criminal penalty for violating the prohibition on use of chemical abortion drugs for abortions; providing definitions; specifying exceptions; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Prohibiting chemical abortions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Did not Consider for Introduction |
2022-03-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-02-23 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 25-4-1-0-0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |