WY SF0083 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to real estate appraisers; creating new definitions; authorizing the certified real estate appraiser board to allow temporary permits; modifying exam prerequisites and experience requirements; modifying provisions relating to management company registration and regulation; updating grounds for disciplinary proceedings; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Real estate appraisers-licensing amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number 63 | |
2019-02-19 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0036 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0036 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0036 |
2019-02-14 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0036 | |
2019-02-14 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-11 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-24 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |