WY SF0083 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to oil and gas; increasing minimum surety bond or other guaranty required for entry upon land for oil and gas operations; setting a minimum blanket bond amount for entry upon land for oil and gas operations; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas operations-bonding requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed SEA0053
2014-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0053
2014-03-05SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0053
2014-03-04 Assigned Number SEA0053
2014-03-04HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-03-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-03-03 Amendment Failed
2014-02-28HousePassed CoW
2014-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-26HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09
2014-02-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-02-24SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-20SenatePassed CoW
2014-02-20 Amendment Failed
2014-02-17SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-17SenateRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09
2014-02-11SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback