WY SF0083 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0084
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0084
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Medicaid; creating the Wyoming Medicaid False Claims Act; authorizing civil recoveries for the state as specified; providing duties of the attorney general and district attorneys; providing procedures; providing for a limitations period and applicability of the act; providing for admissibility of verdicts as specified; providing definitions; prescribing criminal penalties as specified for failure to maintain required records; creating a cause of action for retaliatory employment actions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medicaid fraud recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - House - H Adopted SF0083JC01 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted SF0083JC01 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted SF0083JC01 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 1 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 1 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted SF0083JC01 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted SF0083JC01 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 1 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 1 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0084 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0084 |
2013-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA0084 | |
2013-02-27 | House | Adopted SF0083JC01 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Adopted SF0083JC01 |
2013-02-25 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Did Not Concur |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-22 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-22 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-22 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-22 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-22 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-22 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-12 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 |
2013-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-23 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-22 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-21 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |