WY SF0083 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; requiring preference point programs for resident antelope, deer and elk licenses; providing for fees; providing for rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Game & fish-resident preference points.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-26 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-01-25 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-25 | (S06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S06 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/SF0083.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/SF0083.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/SF0083.htm |