WY SF0082 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to impact assistance payments; amending requirements related to impact assistance payments as specified; providing definitions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Local impact assistance payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Amendment adopted 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Amendment adopted 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2021-03-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-29 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-03 | Bill Number Assigned |