WY SF0081 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 153 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health; creating a lifesaver program; specifying program components; authorizing rulemaking; authorizing grants as specified; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kevin's law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - House - Adopted SF0081JC001: 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Adopted SF0081JC001: 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Adopted SF0081JC001: 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Adopted SF0081JC001: 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Failed 2-28-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Failed 2-28-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0 (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 153 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0072
2015-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0072
2015-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0072
2015-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0072
2015-03-04HouseAdopted SF0081JC001: 55-4-1-0-0
2015-03-03SenateAdopted SF0081JC001: 26-2-2-0-0
2015-02-26HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-25SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-25SenateConcur:Failed 2-28-0-0-0
2015-02-25SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-24House3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0
2015-02-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-18HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-18 Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2015-02-11HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-11 Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2015-02-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2015-02-02HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-29Senate3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0
2015-01-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-27SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-26SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-26 Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-22SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2015-01-22SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-22 Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2015-01-16SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2015-01-16SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback