WY SF0079 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - COW:Failed 8-21-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public employee compensation and benefits; specifying that a local government entity may make coverage through the state employees' and officials' group insurance program available to the officers and employees of the entity; making conforming amendments; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employee group insurance-local governments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - Senate - COW:Failed 8-21-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-17 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateCOW:Failed 8-21-1-0-0
2019-01-17SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-17SenateS06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2019-01-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback