WY SF0079 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-3-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to chiropractic practice; providing for use of the title chiropractic physician; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Title of chiropractors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-3-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-3- (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03 S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-3-1-0-0
2015-02-09SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2015-01-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2015-01-16SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback