WY SF0079 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health nursing; providing for funding and employment of public health nurses as specified; providing for a report; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Public health nursing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and referred to S10; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/SF0079.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/SF0079.pdf |