WY SF0078 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; requiring notification of law enforcement and the coroner when human remains are discovered; providing for exhumation and reinterment of human remains on state and private lands; providing for notification of the state archaeologist and others of archaeological human remains and burials; requiring development of a protocol for consultation, repatriation and reinterment or other disposition of Native American human remains; creating a misdemeanor; making conforming amendments; requiring county coroners to produce an inventory; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Archaeological human burial sites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number 59 | |
2019-02-19 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0031 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0031 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0031 |
2019-02-14 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0031 | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-13 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-11 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2019-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-23 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |