WY SF0078 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the public service commission; revising the repeal date for the office of the consumer advocate; requiring a study; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Office of consumer advocate-repeal date.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] |
Sen. Drew Perkins [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] | Rep. Norine Kasperik [R] | Rep. Thomas Lockhart [R] |
Rep. David Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2016-02-29 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2016-02-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Rerefer to S12 - Rules |
2016-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-17 | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 | |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 22-8-0-0-0 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/SF0078.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Introduced/SF0078.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/SF0078.pdf |