WY SF0076 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - COW:Failed 18-39-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; authorizing warrants to out-of-state providers of electronic communication services and remote computing services; providing procedures; requiring Wyoming providers to comply with out-of-state warrants as specified; providing immunity for compliance; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Warrants for digital records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - COW:Failed 18-39-3-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-08 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseCOW:Failed 18-39-3-0-0
2019-02-08HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-08HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0
2019-01-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-22SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-18SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-18SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback