WY SF0076 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing an appropriation; directing the removal or relocation of bighorn sheep as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Bighorn sheep relocation.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Fred Emerich [R] | Sen. Gerald Geis [R] |
Rep. Kathy Davison [R] | Rep. John Eklund [R] | Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - House - H Adopted SF0076JC01 (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S Adopted SF0076JC01 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S Adopted SF0076JC01 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-19 | Governor Signed SEA0031 | |
2013-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0031 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0031 |
2013-02-14 | Assigned Number SEA0031 | |
2013-02-14 | House | Adopted SF0076JC01 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Adopted SF0076JC01 |
2013-02-12 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Did Not Concur |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-08 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-08 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-08 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-08 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-07 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-07 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-30 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 |
2013-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to S02 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |