WY SF0076 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - (S) Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - (S) Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; providing criteria for qualifying for a state loan and investment board loan or grant as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State loan & investment grants-criteria.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | (S) Failed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S09 | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/SF0076.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Introduced/SF0076.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/SF0076.htm |