WY SF0074 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water and sewer districts; requiring water and sewer districts serving more than a specified number of taps to hold board member elections in conjunction with general elections; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Water and sewer district elections amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2022-03-08 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2022-03-07 | House | H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2022-02-21 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-02-16 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-1-0-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |