WY SF0074 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to professional services procurement; modifying residency requirements related to the procurement of professional architectural, engineering and land surveying services as specified; providing a definition; modifying applicability of residency requirements; modifying contract requirements as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional services procurement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Concur:Recede from Non-Concurrence pursuant to JR 2-4 Passed by Roll Call 23-2-5-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-27-2-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 185
2019-03-08 Governor Signed SEA No. 0070
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0070
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0070
2019-02-26 Assigned Number SEA No. 0070
2019-02-26SenateConcur:Recede from Non-Concurrence pursuant to JR 2-4 Passed by Roll Call 23-2-5-0-0
2019-02-26HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-26SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-26SenateConcur:Failed 1-27-2-0-0
2019-02-26SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0
2019-02-22House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-15HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2019-01-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-22Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-01-18SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-16SenateCOW:Laid Back
2019-01-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-15SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback