WY SF0074 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - H:Did Not Override Veto 20-33-6-0-1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating crimes relating to critical infrastructure; specifying elements; providing penalties; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes against critical infrastructure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - H:Did Not Override Veto 20-33-6-0-1 (Y: 20 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - S:Veto Override 20-5-5-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Concur:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-23-0-0-1 (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-0-0-1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-3-1-1-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-23-0-0-1 (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-0-0-1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-3-1-1-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15 H:Did Not Override Veto 20-33-6-0-1
2018-03-15 S:Veto Override 20-5-5-0-0
2018-03-15 Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0065
2018-03-15 Veto Message Received
2018-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0065
2018-03-10SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0065
2018-03-10 Assigned Number SEA No. 0065
2018-03-10SenateConcur:Passed 21-9-0-0-0
2018-03-10SenateReceived for Concurrence
2018-03-09House3rd Reading:Passed 36-23-0-0-1
2018-03-08House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-07HouseCOW:Passed
2018-03-06HousePlaced on General File
2018-03-06HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-0-0-1
2018-03-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2018-03-01HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-27Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
2018-02-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-22SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-19SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-19SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-3-1-1-0
2018-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback