WY SF0073 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 103 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to welfare; providing for an enhanced eligibility and identity verification process; providing for referral of cases to other agencies; requiring a report; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Welfare fraud prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 103 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed SEA No. 0057
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0057
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0057
2016-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0057
2016-03-03SenateConcur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2016-03-03SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2016-02-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-17SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-17 S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 28-2-0-0-0
2016-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback