WY SF0072 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal history records; requiring statistical reports relating to sexual assault biological evidence and the status of laboratory analysis; providing for publication; amending payment obligations for examination costs; prohibiting the destruction of evidence as specified; providing definition; making conforming amendments; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault biological evidence reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 76
2019-02-26 Governor Signed SEA No. 0047
2019-02-21HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0047
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0047
2019-02-20 Assigned Number SEA No. 0047
2019-02-20SenateConcur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2019-02-20SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-19House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2019-02-15House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-14HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-13HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-13HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-02-11HouseH01 - Judiciary:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2019-01-18Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-17SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-16SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-16SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback