WY SF0072 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Medicaid benefit recovery; amending provisions for recovery of Medicaid expenses from parents; authorizing the departments of health and family services to cooperate in collecting child support and recoupment of Medicaid expenses as specified; granting rulemaking authority; requiring reports; providing appropriations; authorizing transfer of funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medicaid benefit recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - H Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 |
2013-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-23 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to S02 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-04 | Bill Number Assigned |