WY SF0071 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0053
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0053
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to aquatic invasive species; providing for mandatory inspections of conveyances entering the state as specified; providing for rulemaking; providing for establishment of check stations as specified; providing an appropriation; authorizing positions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Aquatic invasive species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0053 | |
2012-03-07 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0053 | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned Number SEA0053 | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-02 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-02 | (H06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H06 | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-27 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-23 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-23 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-21 | (S06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S06 | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-13 | Bill Number Assigned |