WY SF0070 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 38 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 38 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public utilities; amending notice requirements for cooperative electric utility rate increases; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Cooperative electric utility rate adjustment- notice.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Leland Christensen [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Rep. Marti Halverson [R] |
Rep. Robert McKim [R] | Rep. Andy Schwartz [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Chapter No. 38 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-02-25 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0010 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0010 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0010 |
2015-02-20 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0010 | |
2015-02-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 |
2015-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-17 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-22 | Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |