WY SF0070 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to civil actions; providing that an owner of real property has no duty to a trespasser as specified; providing exceptions; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Land possessor duty to trespasser.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Geis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Did Not Concur |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-19 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-19 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-15 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-14 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-07 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-07 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2013-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Laid Back Without Prejudice |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-03 | Bill Number Assigned |