WY SF0069 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to rural health care districts; clarifying the authority of districts to own and operate a nursing home as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Rural health care district authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-13-2-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 74 | |
2020-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0029 | |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0029 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0029 |
2020-03-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0029 | |
2020-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 45-13-2-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-03 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2020-02-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-19 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 26-3-1-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-03 | Bill Number Assigned |