WY SF0069 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to revision of inadvertent errors; correcting statutory references and language resulting from inadvertent errors and omissions in previously adopted legislation; correcting obsolete references; repealing fully executed provisions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revisor's bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - H12 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - S12 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-03 Assigned Chapter Number
2011-03-03 Governor Signed SEA No. 0075
2011-03-01 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0075
2011-02-28 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0075
2011-02-28 Assigned Number SEA No. 0075
2011-02-28 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-25 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-24 (H) Passed CoW
2011-02-23 (H) Placed on General File
2011-02-23 (H12) Recommended Do Pass
2011-02-01 (H) Introduced and Referred to H12
2011-01-27 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-25 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-24 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-21 (S) Passed CoW
2011-01-20 (S) Placed on General File
2011-01-20 (S12) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-13 (S) Rereferred to S12
2011-01-11 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2011-01-11 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback