WY SF0068 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property taxes; providing a property tax exemption for tangible personal property; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tangible personal property-tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-6-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Amendment adopted 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-3-3-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-6-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Amendment adopted 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-3-3-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2024-03-05 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2024-03-04 | House | H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2024-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-6-0-0-0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-22 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | : Refer to S03 - Revenue |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-3-3-0-0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-01-30 | Bill Number Assigned |