WY SF0068 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 99 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 99 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state agency planning; modifying legislative review requirements; repealing provisions related to major program reports by the legislative service office; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Amendments to agency plans and new program review-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 12-0-1-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 12-0-1-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Chapter No. 99 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0051 | |
2018-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number 99 | |
2018-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0051 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0051 |
2018-03-09 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0051 | |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-08 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | House | H12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 12-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H12 - Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-31 | Bill Number Assigned |