WY SF0067 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; allowing a person with a disability to be issued a special license plate with a disabled designation for a multipurpose vehicle; specifying that a distinctive symbol may be used on a disabled license plate to designate vehicle type; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Multipurpose vehicles-disabled license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-7-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27 Assigned Chapter Number 113
2023-02-27 Governor Signed SEA No. 0061
2023-02-24HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0061
2023-02-24SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0061
2023-02-24 Assigned Number SEA No. 0061
2023-02-24House3rd Reading:Passed 55-7-0-0-0
2023-02-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2023-02-22HouseCOW:Passed
2023-02-21HousePlaced on General File
2023-02-21HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2023-02-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2023-01-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2023-01-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-1-0-0
2023-01-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2023-01-19SenateCOW:Passed
2023-01-19SenatePlaced on General File
2023-01-19SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2023-01-04SenateReceived for Introduction
2022-12-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback