WY SF0066 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to wills, decedents' estates and probate code; specifying that taking the life of another precludes rights of survivorship and payable on death benefits; specifying the order in which benefits accrue as between the deceased and the person who caused the death; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Slayer rule-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06 Assigned Chapter Number 117
2021-04-06 Governor Signed SEA No. 0056
2021-04-02HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0056
2021-04-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0056
2021-04-01 Assigned Number SEA No. 0056
2021-04-01SenateConcur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2021-04-01SenateReceived for Concurrence
2021-04-01House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2021-03-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-30HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-26HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-26HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2021-03-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2021-03-19HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-03-19Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
2021-03-18Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-17Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2021-03-12Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2021-03-11SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-08SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-08SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2021-01-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0066
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/SF0066.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Engross/SF0066.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Enroll/SF0066.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0066SS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0066SW001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0066S2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0066S2002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0066S2003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0066HS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0066H2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0066H3001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/SF0066.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0066#-377
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0066#314
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0066#-686
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0066#5357
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0066#452

Bill Comments

feedback