WY SF0065 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - COW:Failed 5-24-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; providing for primary elections allowing any voter to vote for any candidate; requiring ranked choice voting at primary and general elections as specified; modifying requirements for primary and general election ballots; amending definitions relating to qualifications of political parties; eliminating election of precinct committeemen and committeewomen at primary elections; modifying procedures for filling of vacancies in nomination; requiring rulemaking; making conforming amendments; removing obsolete language; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open ranked choice elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - Senate - COW:Failed 5-24-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23SenateCOW:Failed 5-24-1-0-0
2019-01-22SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-22SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback