WY SF0065 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 0-5-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 0-5-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating a new sexual assault offense; specifying elements of the offense; specifying penalties; limiting defenses as specified; modifying the definition of position of authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sexual assault-position of authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Aaron Clausen [R] | Rep. Dan Kirkbride [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 0-5-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 0-5-0-0-0 | |
2017-02-03 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-06 | Bill Number Assigned |