WY SF0065 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 106 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to patent infringement; prohibiting bad faith assertion of patent infringement; providing exceptions; specifying factors for determination of bad faith; providing a right of action; providing for damages; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patent trolling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - House - Adopted SF0065JC001: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted SF0065JC001: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Adopted SF0065JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Adopted SF0065JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 106 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed SEA No. 0061
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0061
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0061
2016-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0061
2016-03-04HouseAdopted SF0065JC001: 60-0-0-0-0
2016-03-03SenateAdopted SF0065JC001: 30-0-0-0-0
2016-03-01HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-02-29SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-02-29SenateConcur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0
2016-02-29SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-29House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2016-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-23 H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2016-02-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-15 S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback