WY SF0065 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Died In Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Died In Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the department of health; establishing the substance abuse grant program to be administered by the department of health; providing rulemaking authority; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Substance abuse grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-27 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/SF0065.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/SF0065.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/SF0065.htm |