WY SF0065 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - (H) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - (H) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to children and families; providing for termination of parental rights for failure to provide support and maintain regular personal contact; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Termination of parental rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Davison [R] | Rep. Keith Gingery [R] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Sen. Tony Ross [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S01 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S01 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | (H) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2010-02-25 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-25 | (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-22 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-19 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-17 | (S01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S01 | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |